Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giacomo Morandi

Secretary of the Congregation for the Doctrine of the Faith

Titular Archbishop of Caere


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1965 Born
11 Apr 199024.6Ordained PriestPriest of Modena-Nonantola, Italy
27 Oct 201550.1AppointedOfficial of the Congregation for the Doctrine of the Faith
18 Jul 201751.9AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for the Doctrine of the Faith
18 Jul 201751.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Caere
30 Sep 201752.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Caere

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Morandi (VIAF: 215155624)
Archbishop Giacomo Morandi (born ) Secretary of Doctrine of the Faith

EventPlace
Birth PlaceModena, Archdiocese of Modena (e Nonantola), Italy
Ordained BishopCathedral, Modena, Archdiocese of Modena-Nonantola, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Congregation for the Doctrine of the Faith.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Jul 2017
  • ob: CB, 18 Jul 2017
  • ob: CB, 26 Jul 2017
  • c2: CB, 2 Sep 2017
  • c34: CB, 30 Sep 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 2 Oct 2017