Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gherardo Araldi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Carpi

Titular Bishop of Amathus in Palaestina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1819BornModena
21 May 184222.6Ordained PriestPriest
27 Oct 187152.1AppointedBishop of Carpi, Italy
17 Dec 187152.2Ordained BishopBishop of Carpi, Italy
11 Dec 1891³72.2ResignedBishop of Carpi, Italy
14 Dec 189172.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Amathus in Palaestina
5 Feb 189575.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Carpi, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gherardo Araldi:
Bishop Gherardo Araldi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Carpi

  • a priest for 52.7 years
  • a bishop for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 93, and Page 184
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,219

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013