Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Cesare Boccoleri

Deceased

Archbishop of Modena (e Nonantola)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1875BornRapallo
19 Dec 189722.7Ordained PriestPriest
13 Jun 192146.2AppointedBishop of Terni e Narni, Italy
29 Jun 192146.3Ordained BishopBishop of Terni e Narni, Italy
11 Dec 192146.7InstalledBishop of Terni e Narni, Italy
28 Mar 194065.0AppointedArchbishop of Modena (e Nonantola), Italy
31 Oct 195681.6DiedArchbishop of Modena (e Nonantola), Italy

MicroData Summary for Cesare Boccoleri:
Archbishop Cesare Boccoleri (born , died ) Archbishop of Modena (e Nonantola)

  • a priest for 58.9 years
  • a bishop for 35.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013