Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carlo Maria Borgognoni

Deceased

Archbishop of Modena (e Nonantola), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1836Born
22 Dec 186024.1Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jan 188649.1AppointedArchbishop of Urbino, Italy
24 Jan 188649.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Urbino, Italy
24 May 188952.5AppointedArchbishop of Modena (e Nonantola), Italy
20 Aug 190063.7DiedArchbishop of Modena (e Nonantola), Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Maria Borgognoni (VIAF: 307356438)
Archbishop Carlo Maria Borgognoni (born , died ) Archbishop of Modena (e Nonantola)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBologna, Archdiocese of Bologna
Ordained BishopS. Apollinaire, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 39.6 years
  • a bishop for 14.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 398, and Page 575
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1886, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 May 2017