Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Bourges

Archidioecesis Bituricensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Erected: 3rd Century
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Tours
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: France
  • Square Kilometers: 14,210 (5,488 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Centre
  • Official Web Site: https://www.diocese-bourges.org/
  • Mailing Address: Archeveche, 4 avenue du 95eme-de-Ligne, 18000 Bourges CEDEX, France
  • Telephone: 2.48.23.12.90
  • Fax: 2.48.24.94.18

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
3rd CenturyErectedArchdiocese of Bourges (erected)
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Nevers (suppressed) Archdiocese of Bourges
27 July 1817Territory LostDiocese of Autun
Archdiocese of Bourges
Diocese of Clermont
Diocese of Moulins (erected)
6 October 1822Territory LostArchdiocese of Bourges Diocese of Nevers
8 December 2002ElevatedArchdiocese of Bourges (no longer a Metropolitan)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1950505,000538,00093.9%441354761,06070560506ap1951
1959500,000531,81294.0%370474171,199112550505ap1960
1969532,000551,43096.5%351594101,29759478164ap1971
1980520,000585,00088.9%2301013311,5701167550507ap1981
1990520,000588,00088.4%175862611,9924153466507ap1991
1999508,000576,00088.2%148752232,2781112538467ap2000
2000511,000579,00088.3%139692082,4561311738067ap2001
2001500,000545,56791.6%132671992,5121511337567ap2002
2002500,000545,66791.6%135662012,4871611932864ap2003
2003500,000545,56791.6%119401593,144178934864ap2004
2004500,000545,56791.6%120231433,496157034064ap2005
2006501,000546,71591.6%106331393,604177432564ap2007
2012502,700549,90091.4%100271273,9581810923264ap2013
2015502,400541,86992.7%7424985,126205514864ap2016

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_d, v3.2.2, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 28 Apr 2018

Quantcast