Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Andrew Forman, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1465Born
26 Nov 150136.9AppointedBishop of Moray, Scotland, Great Britain
15 Jul 151348.5AppointedArchbishop of Bourges, France
13 Nov 151449.8AppointedArchbishop of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain
12 Mar 152156.1DiedArchbishop of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Andrew Forman (VIAF: 285479430)
Archbishop Andrew Forman O.S.A. (born 1465, died ) Archbishop of Saint Andrews

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHutton, Berwickshire

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 135, and Page 108
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 250
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1501, Number 29*
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 196
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 89, Number 7,451
  • ~ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 92, Number 7,451

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast