Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean de Montpezat de Carbon

Deceased

Archbishop of Sens


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1605¹BornSaint-Martory
15 Jun 165752.4SelectedBishop of Saint-Papoul, France
3 Jun 165853.4ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Papoul, France
8 Sep 165853.6Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Papoul, France
18 Dec 166459.9SelectedArchbishop of Bourges, France
22 Apr 166560.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Bourges, France
14 Oct 167469.7SelectedArchbishop of Sens, France
6 May 167570.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Sens, France
5 Nov 168580.8DiedArchbishop of Sens, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean de Montpezat de Carbon:
Archbishop Jean de Montpezat de Carbon (died ) Archbishop of Sens

  • a bishop for 27.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 116, and Page 274
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1658, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 11 Apr 2015; Data: 13 Apr 2015