Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claude-Antoine-François Jacquemet Gaultier d’Ancyse

Deceased

Bishop of Luçon, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1707¹Born
4 Apr 175952.2AppointedBishop of Luçon, France
29 Apr 175952.3Ordained BishopBishop of Luçon, France
27 Oct 177568.8DiedBishop of Luçon, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Claude-Antoine-François Jacquemet Gaultier d’Ancyse
Bishop Claude-Antoine-François Jacquemet Gaultier d’Ancyse (born 1707, died ) Bishop of Luçon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBourges, Archdiocese of Bourges

  • a bishop for 16.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1759, Number 13
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 267

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast