Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Simon Cardinal of Beaulieu

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Dec 1281AppointedArchbishop of Bourges, France
18 Sep 1294AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
18 Sep 1294Elevated to Cardinal
18 Aug 1297DiedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

MicroData Summary for Simon of Beaulieu:
Cardinal Simon of Beaulieu (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

  • a cardinal for 2.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 138
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Sep 1294

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 4 Jan 2014