Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Martin-Jérôme Izart

Deceased

Archbishop of Bourges


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jun 1854BornEstagel
21 Dec 187824.5Ordained PriestPriest of Perpignan-Elne, France
31 May 190753.0AppointedBishop of Pamiers, France
11 Jun 190753.0Ordained BishopBishop of Pamiers, France
9 May 191661.9AppointedArchbishop of Bourges, France
23 Aug 191662.2InstalledArchbishop of Bourges, France
31 May 193480.0DiedArchbishop of Bourges, France

MicroData Summary for Martin-Jérôme Izart:
Archbishop Martin-Jérôme Izart (born , died ) Archbishop of Bourges

  • a priest for 55.4 years
  • a bishop for 27.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 61, and Page 87
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1907, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013