Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Poitiers

Archidioecesis Pictaviensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 8 December 2002
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: France
  • Square Kilometers: 13,098 (5,059 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Sud-Ouest
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocese-poitiers.com.fr/
  • Mailing Address: 44 rue Jean-Jaures, 86035 Poitiers CEDEX, France
  • Telephone: 5.49.50.12.05
  • Fax: 5.49.60.07.73

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Poitiers
3rd CenturyErectedDiocese of Poitiers (erected)
11 July 1317Territory LostDiocese of Poitiers Diocese of Maillezais (erected)
16 August 1317Territory LostDiocese of Poitiers Diocese of Luçon (erected)
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Saintes (suppressed) Diocese of Angoulême
Diocese of La Rochelle
Diocese of Poitiers
Archdiocese of Poitiers
8 December 2002ElevatedDiocese of Poitiers Archdiocese of Poitiers

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Poitiers
1950580,000613,48794.5%6661267927321521,703643ap1951
1970632,000666,71894.8%6061237298661681,105605ap1971
1980665,000698,00095.3%456875431,2242129851604ap1981
1990693,000716,00096.8%379584371,585201171,015604ap1991
1999672,610725,94292.7%300143142,1422547699604ap2000
2000670,000744,34290.0%294123062,1892627674604ap2001
2001669,000743,41690.0%290133032,2072644665604ap2002
Archdiocese of Poitiers
2002669,000743,41190.0%279122912,2982745595604ap2003
2003670,000743,41790.1%26892772,4183039558604ap2004
2004670,000743,41790.1%261362972,2553353535604ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 7 Aug 2014