Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Alphonse Blanchet

Deceased

Bishop of Gap, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1829Born
17 Oct 185222.9Ordained PriestPriest of Bourges, France
2 May 188757.4SelectedBishop of Gap, France
26 May 188757.5ConfirmedBishop of Gap, France
1 Aug 188757.7Ordained BishopBishop of Gap, France
1 Sep 188757.7InstalledBishop of Gap, France
19 May 188858.5DiedBishop of Gap, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Alphonse Blanchet
Bishop Jean-Alphonse Blanchet (born , died ) Bishop of Gap

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChâteauroux
Ordained BishopCathedral, Bourges, Archdiocese of Bourges

  • a priest for 35.5 years
  • a bishop for .7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 582
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1887, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast