Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Pierre Aymery (Aimerici)

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}

Administrator of Carcassonne


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Oct 1390AppointedArchbishop of Bourges, France
2 Jul 1409AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Carcassonne, France
24 Jul 1409AppointedAdministrator of Carcassonne, France
24 Jul 1409AppointedTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}
1412¹DiedTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre Aymery (Aimerici):
Patriarch Pierre Aymery (Aimerici) Titular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 139, and Page 166
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 82

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013