Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop André Frémyot

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Bourges, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Aug 1573Born
16 Jun 160329.8AppointedArchbishop of Bourges, France
7 Dec 160330.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bourges, France
1621²47.3ResignedArchbishop of Bourges, France
13 May 164167.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Bourges, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for André Frémyot
Archbishop André Frémyot (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Bourges

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDijon

  • a bishop for 37.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 116
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1603, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast