Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Nevers

Dioecesis Nivernensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Restored: 6 October 1822
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Dijon
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: France
  • Square Kilometers: 6,816 (2,632 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Centre
  • Official Web Site: http://catho58.cef.fr/
  • Mailing Address: 3 Place du Palais, 58000 Nevers, France
  • Telephone: 3.86.61.02.89
  • Fax: 3.86.59.21.93

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Nevers
4th CenturyErectedDiocese of Nevers (erected)
29 November 1801SuppressedDiocese of Nevers (suppressed) Archdiocese of Bourges
Diocese of Nevers
6 October 1822RestoredArchdiocese of Bourges Diocese of Nevers
8 December 2002Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Nevers (from Sens)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Nevers
1950240,000248,55996.6%23572429917270309ap1951
1970235,000247,70294.9%17661821,29113325311ap1971
1980251,900.0%1348142014298311ap1981
1990235,000246,00095.5%9871052,23811223364ap1991
1999229,300233,00098.4%696753,05741018663ap2000
2000221,300225,00098.4%687752,95041119263ap2001
2001221,000225,60098.0%689772,87041319263ap2002
2002221,000225,60098.0%599683,25061319263ap2003
2003221,000225,60098.0%638713,11261218952ap2004
2004180,000232,00077.6%607672,68661120251ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 19 Jan 2014; data: 24 Jan 2014