Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop François Michel Pierre Kalist

Archbishop of Clermont


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1958 BornBourges
21 Dec 198628.1Ordained PriestPriest of Bourges, France
25 Mar 200950.4AppointedBishop of Limoges, France
17 May 200950.5Ordained BishopBishop of Limoges, France
20 Sep 201657.8AppointedArchbishop of Clermont, France
27 Nov 201658.0InstalledArchbishop of Clermont, France

MicroData Summary for François Michel Pierre Kalist
Archbishop François Michel Pierre Kalist (born ) Archbishop of Clermont

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Clermont.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Mar 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,173
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Sep 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 21 Sep 2016