Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sylvain Jean-Luc Bataille, S.J.M.V.

Bishop of Saint-Etienne

Note/Previous Titular See: (Société Jean-Marie Vianney)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jul 1964 BornSoissons
11 Mar 198924.6Ordained PriestPriest of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis), France
18 May 201651.8AppointedBishop of Saint-Etienne, France
3 Jul 201651.9Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Etienne, France
4 Jul 201651.9InstalledBishop of Saint-Etienne, France

MicroData Summary for Sylvain Jean-Luc Bataille
Bishop Sylvain Jean-Luc Bataille S.J.M.V. (born ) Bishop of Saint-Etienne

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Saint-Etienne.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 May 2016
  • ob/i: CB, 18 May 2016
  • c2+: CB, 25 May 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,952

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 10 Jul 2016