Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alexis-Basile-Alexandre Menjaud

Deceased

Archbishop of Bourges


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jun 1791BornChusclan
21 Dec 181625.6Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jul 183847.1SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Nancy (-Toul), France
18 Feb 183947.7ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Nancy (-Toul), France
18 Feb 183947.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Ioppe
2 Jun 183948.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ioppe
11 Jul 184453.1SucceededBishop of Nancy (-Toul), France
23 Aug 185968.2SelectedArchbishop of Bourges, France
26 Sep 185968.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Bourges, France
17 Nov 185968.5InstalledArchbishop of Bourges, France
10 Dec 186170.5DiedArchbishop of Bourges, France

MicroData Summary for Alexis-Basile-Alexandre Menjaud:
Archbishop Alexis-Basile-Alexandre Menjaud (born , died ) Archbishop of Bourges

  • a priest for 45.0 years
  • a bishop for 22.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 150
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 225, and Page 275

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013