Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Roland Hébert

Deceased

Archbishop of Bourges


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1560BornBeaumont-sur-Oise
14 Mar 162262.2AppointedArchbishop of Bourges, France
16 May 162262.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bourges, France
21 Jun 163878.5DiedArchbishop of Bourges, France

MicroData Summary for Roland Hébert:
Archbishop Roland Hébert (died ) Archbishop of Bourges

  • a bishop for 16.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 116

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013