Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Marie-Charles-Isidore de Mercy

Deceased

Archbishop of Bourges, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1736Born
17 Nov 177539.7SelectedBishop of Luçon, France
29 Jan 177639.9ConfirmedBishop of Luçon, France
18 Feb 177640.0Ordained BishopBishop of Luçon, France
24 Oct 180165.7ResignedBishop of Luçon, France
12 Apr 180266.1SelectedArchbishop of Bourges, France
15 Apr 180266.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Bourges, France
18 Feb 181175.0DiedArchbishop of Bourges, France

MicroData Summary for Marie-Charles-Isidore de Mercy
Archbishop Marie-Charles-Isidore de Mercy (born , died ) Archbishop of Bourges

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMaubec

  • a bishop for 35.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 113
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1776, Number 9
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 267

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast