Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Pottier, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Se-Ciuen (Setchoan)

Titular Bishop of Agathopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Mar 1726BornSaint-Hippolyte, France
175326.8ProfessedMember of La Société des Missions Etrangères
22 Sep 175327.5Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
24 Jan 176740.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Se-Ciuen (Setchoan), China
24 Jan 176740.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Agathopolis
10 Sep 176943.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Agathopolis
28 Sep 179266.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Se-Ciuen (Setchoan), China

MicroData Summary for François Pottier:
Bishop François Pottier M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Se-Ciuen (Setchoan)

  • a priest for 39.0 years
  • a bishop for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 69, and Page 455

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015