Catholic-Hierarchy DC

René Cardinal de Prie

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Limoges

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina

Note/Previous Titular See: (excommunicated from 24 Oct 1511 to 24 Apr 1514)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1451BornTouraine
3 Aug 149847.6AppointedBishop of Bayeux, France
18 Dec 150656.0Elevated to Cardinal
17 May 150756.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Lucia in Septisolio
7 Nov 150958.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Vitale
17 Mar 151160.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina
18 Aug 151463.6AppointedBishop of Limoges, France
24 Nov 151665.9ResignedBishop of Bayeux, France
5 Dec 151665.9ResignedBishop of Limoges, France
9 Sep 151968.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Limoges, France

MicroData Summary for René de Prie:
Cardinal René de Prie (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Limoges

  • a cardinal for 12.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1506

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013