Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Etienne-Jean-Baptiste des Galois de la Tour

Deceased

Archbishop of Bourges, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1750Born
28 May 177423.9Ordained PriestPriest
9 Sep 181767.2SelectedArchbishop of Bourges, France
1 Oct 181767.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Bourges, France
26 Sep 181969.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bourges, France
20 Mar 182069.7DiedArchbishop of Bourges, France

MicroData Summary for Etienne-Jean-Baptiste des Galois de la Tour
Archbishop Etienne-Jean-Baptiste des Galois de la Tour (born , died ) Archbishop of Bourges

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAix-en-Provence

  • a priest for 45.8 years
  • a bishop for .4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 113
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1819, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast