Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pierre d’Hardivillier

Deceased

Archbishop of Bourges


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1579¹BornPicardie
10 Nov 164263.8AppointedArchbishop of Bourges, France
8 Feb 164364.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bourges, France
9 Oct 164970.7DiedArchbishop of Bourges, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre d’Hardivillier:
Archbishop Pierre d’Hardivillier (died ) Archbishop of Bourges

  • a bishop for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 116
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1643, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 20 Mar 2015