Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jacques-Marie-Antoine-Célestin Cardinal du Pont

Deceased

Archbishop of Bourges

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1792BornIglesias, Italy
Sep 1815³23.6Ordained PriestPriest of Sens, France
3 May 182432.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sens (-Auxerre), France
3 May 182432.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Samosata
29 Jun 182432.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Samosata
20 May 183038.3SelectedBishop of Saint-Dié, France
5 Jul 183038.4ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Dié, France
17 May 183543.3SelectedArchbishop of Avignon, France
24 Jul 183543.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Avignon, France
30 Dec 184149.9SelectedArchbishop of Bourges, France
24 Jan 184250.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Bourges, France
15 Mar 184250.1InstalledArchbishop of Bourges, France
11 Jun 184755.4Elevated to Cardinal
4 Oct 184755.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo
26 May 185967.3DiedArchbishop of Bourges, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jacques-Marie-Antoine-Célestin du Pont:
Cardinal Jacques-Marie-Antoine-Célestin du Pont (born , died ) Archbishop of Bourges

  • a priest for 43.7 years
  • a bishop for 34.9 years
  • a cardinal for 12.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 50
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 100, and Page 113
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 174, and Page 332

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013