Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claude du Vergier

Deceased

Bishop of Lavaur, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1566¹Born
24 Apr 160640.3AppointedBishop of Lavaur, France
16 Jul 160640.5Ordained BishopBishop of Lavaur, France
25 Mar 163670.2DiedBishop of Lavaur, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Claude du Vergier
Bishop Claude du Vergier (born 1566, died ) Bishop of Lavaur

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBourges, Archdiocese of Bourges

  • a bishop for 29.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1606, Number 13
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 360

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast