Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Auguste Marchal

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Bourges, France

Titular Bishop of Sinope


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1824Born
22 Sep 184824.4Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jun 188864.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bourges, France
1 Jun 188864.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Sinope
30 Jul 188864.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sinope
26 May 189268.1ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Bourges, France
16 Jan 190075.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Bourges, France

MicroData Summary for Auguste Marchal
Bishop Auguste Marchal (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Bourges

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRaon l'Étape
Ordained BishopCathedral, Bourges, Archdiocese of Bourges

  • a priest for 51.3 years
  • a bishop for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 520
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1888, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 May 2017