Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pierre Cardinal Bertrand (Sr.)

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Clemente


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Mar 1280³Born
28 Jan 132039.9AppointedBishop of Nevers, France
19 May 132242.2AppointedBishop of Autun, France
133049.8AppointedArchbishop of Bourges, France
20 Dec 133151.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
20 Dec 133151.8Elevated to Cardinal
23 Jun 134969.3DiedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Pierre Bertrand (Sr.) (VIAF: 230023636)
Pierre Cardinal Bertrand (Sr.) (born Mar 1280, died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Clemente

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAnnonay, France

  • a cardinal for 17.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Dec 1331

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast