Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Joseph-Charles Cardinal Lefèbvre

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Bourges, France

Cardinal-Priest of San Giovanni Battista dei Fiorentini


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1892Born
17 Dec 192129.6Ordained PriestPriest of Poitiers, France
27 Jul 193846.2AppointedBishop of Troyes, France
11 Oct 193846.4Ordained BishopBishop of Troyes, France
17 Jun 194351.1AppointedArchbishop of Bourges, France
28 Mar 196067.9Elevated to Cardinal
28 Mar 196067.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni Battista dei Fiorentini
10 Oct 196977.4RetiredArchbishop of Bourges, France
2 Apr 197380.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Bourges, France

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Charles Lefèbvre
Joseph-Charles Cardinal Lefèbvre (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Bourges

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTourcoing

  • a priest for 51.2 years
  • a bishop for 34.4 years
  • a cardinal for 13.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 77

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 19 Jul 2018

Quantcast