Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Joseph Marchal

Deceased

Archbishop of Bourges


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1822BornRaon l'Étape
17 May 184523.1Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jun 187553.1SelectedBishop of Belley, France
5 Jul 187553.2ConfirmedBishop of Belley, France
8 Sep 187553.4Ordained BishopBishop of Belley, France
7 Feb 188057.8SelectedArchbishop of Bourges, France
27 Feb 188057.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Bourges, France
27 Apr 188058.0InstalledArchbishop of Bourges, France
26 May 189270.1DiedArchbishop of Bourges, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Joseph Marchal:
Archbishop Jean-Joseph Marchal (born , died ) Archbishop of Bourges

  • a priest for 47.0 years
  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 145, and Page 150

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013