Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pierre Marie Léon Augustin Plateau

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Bourges, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1924Born
28 Jun 194723.4Ordained PriestPriest of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France
2 Feb 197955.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France
2 Feb 197955.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Gunela
22 Apr 197955.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gunela
8 Apr 198460.2AppointedArchbishop of Bourges, France
25 Apr 200076.2RetiredArchbishop of Bourges, France
26 Apr 201894.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Bourges, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre Marie Léon Augustin Plateau
Archbishop Pierre Marie Léon Augustin Plateau (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Bourges

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Servan-sur-Mer
Death PlaceHospital, Saint-Malo
Buried Place (Original)Tomb of the Archbishops, Cathedral, Bourges, Archdiocese of Bourges

  • a priest for 70.8 years
  • a bishop for 39.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 27 Apr 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast