Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Christophe André Robert Lagleize

Bishop Emeritus of Metz, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1954 Born
28 Jun 198126.6Ordained PriestPriest of Bourges, France
11 Dec 200147.0AppointedBishop of Valence (-Die-Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux), France
23 Feb 200247.2Ordained BishopBishop of Valence (-Die-Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux), France
27 Sep 201358.8AppointedBishop of Metz, France
13 Aug 202166.7ResignedBishop of Metz, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Christophe André Robert Lagleize
Bishop Jean-Christophe André Robert Lagleize (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Metz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSoisy-sous-Montmorency
Ordained BishopParc des Expositions, Valence, Diocese of Valence (-Die-Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux)

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Metz.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Number 14,138
  • ab: Bollettino, 27 Sep 2013
  • ab: CB, 8 Oct 2013
  • r: Bollettino, 13 Aug 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 14 Aug 2021

Quantcast