Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Auguste de Chastenet de Puységur

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Bourges


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1740BornRabastens
1 Oct 177433.8SelectedBishop of Saint-Omer, France
29 May 177534.5ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Omer, France
29 Jun 177534.6Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Omer, France
14 Jun 177837.5SelectedBishop of Carcassonne, France
18 Jul 177837.6ResignedBishop of Saint-Omer, France
20 Jul 177837.6ConfirmedBishop of Carcassonne, France
6 Apr 178847.4SelectedArchbishop of Bourges, France
12 Sep 178847.8ResignedBishop of Carcassonne, France
15 Sep 178847.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Bourges, France
15 Mar 180261.3ResignedArchbishop of Bourges, France
14 Aug 181574.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Bourges, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Auguste de Chastenet de Puységur:
Archbishop Jean-Auguste de Chastenet de Puységur (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Bourges

  • a bishop for 40.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1775, Number 26
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 106, and Page 124
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 148

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Dec 2015