Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Hubert Marie Pierre Dominique Barbier

Archbishop Emeritus of Bourges


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Aug 1932 BornLa-Chaize-le-Vicomte
18 Sep 195523.1Ordained PriestPriest
6 Oct 198048.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Annecy, France
6 Oct 198048.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Noba
13 Dec 198048.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Noba
19 May 198451.8AppointedBishop of Annecy, France
25 Apr 200067.7AppointedArchbishop of Bourges, France
11 Sep 200775.1RetiredArchbishop of Bourges, France

MicroData Summary for Hubert Marie Pierre Dominique Barbier:
Archbishop Hubert Marie Pierre Dominique Barbier (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Bourges

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Bourges.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Sep 2007

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Jun 2014