Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claude Bardel

Deceased

Bishop of Sées {Séez}, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1851Born
30 Nov 187423.7Ordained PriestPriest
18 May 189443.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bourges, France
18 May 189443.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Paros
1 Aug 189443.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Paros
14 Apr 189746.1SelectedBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
19 Apr 189746.1ConfirmedBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
29 Jul 189746.4InstalledBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
16 Feb 192674.9DiedBishop of Sées {Séez}, France

MicroData Summary for Claude Bardel (VIAF: 305115052)
Bishop Claude Bardel (born , died ) Bishop of Sées {Séez}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceThiers
Ordained BishopCathedral, Bourges, Archdiocese of Bourges

  • a priest for 51.2 years
  • a bishop for 31.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 441, and Page 490
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1894, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017