Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Clermont

Archidioecesis Claromontanus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 8 December 2002
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: France
  • Square Kilometers: 8,016 (3,096 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Centre-Est
  • Official Web Site: http://catholique-clermont.cef.fr/
  • Mailing Address: Archeveche, 23 rue Pascal, 63000 Clermont-Ferrand, France
  • Telephone: 4.73.98.01.40
  • Fax: 4.73.98.01.49

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Clermont
3rd CenturyErectedDiocese of Clermont (erected)
20 February 1317Territory LostDiocese of Clermont Diocese of Saint-Flour (erected)
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Le Puy-en-Velay (suppressed) Diocese of Clermont
Archdiocese of Clermont
8 December 2002ElevatedDiocese of Clermont Archdiocese of Clermont

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Clermont
1950460,000479,72895.9%492505428481001,000516ap1951
1969520,800544,56895.6%410434531,1491281,194215ap1971
1980453,000583,80077.6%351133641,24423683521ap1981
1990506,000621,00081.5%263112741,846348530520ap1991
1999540,000602,93989.6%205442492,168978371521ap2000
2000535,000602,97888.7%184382222,4091663373521ap2001
2001587,666604,09697.3%18951943,0291832354521ap2002
Archdiocese of Clermont
2002587,666604,09697.3%16431673,5181930328521ap2003
2003588,600604,09697.4%17541793,2882016320521ap2004
2004588,600604,26697.4%17271793,2882032325474ap2005
2006584,400604,26696.7%15871653,541222928037ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 21 Dec 2013