Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Jiménez Pérez, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1715³BornSoto de Cameros, Spain
4 Mar 177156.0AppointedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
30 Nov 177156.7Ordained BishopBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
25 May 177257.2InstalledBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
20 Aug 178166.5DiedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Jiménez Pérez:
Bishop Manuel Jiménez Pérez O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)

  • a bishop for 9.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,650
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 89, Number 453
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1771, Number 35
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 345

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 14 Dec 2015