Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego de Salamanca, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1519²Born
28 Mar 157657.2AppointedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
4 Apr 158768.2ResignedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
1588²69.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego de Salamanca (VIAF: 38659099)
Bishop Diego de Salamanca O.S.A. (born 1519, died 1588) Bishop Emeritus of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBurgos, Diocese of Burgos, Spain
Death PlaceBurgos, Archdiocese of Burgos, Spain

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 87, Number 529
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 278
  • d: CB, 25 Jul 2014
  • bd/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1576, Number 10*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast