Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alberto Arturo Figueroa Morales

Auxiliary Bishop of San Juan de Puerto Rico

Titular Bishop of Phelbes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Aug 1961 Born
1985²23.3Temporary VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
1989²27.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Arecibo, Puerto Rico
2 Jun 199028.8Ordained PriestPriest of Arecibo, Puerto Rico
1991²29.3IncardinatedPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
1995²33.3Solemn VowsPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
2010²48.3IncardinatedPriest of San Juan de Puerto Rico
19 Nov 201958.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Juan de Puerto Rico
19 Nov 201958.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Phelbes
27 Dec 201958.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Phelbes

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alberto Arturo Figueroa Morales
Bishop Alberto Arturo Figueroa Morales (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of San Juan de Puerto Rico

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuaynabo, Archdiocese of San Juan de Puerto Rico
Ordained BishopSanta Teresita del Niño Jesús, Church, Santurce, Archdiocese of San Juan de Puerto Rico

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of San Juan de Puerto Rico.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Nov 2019
  • mn/b: CB, 19 Nov 2019
  • ob/c2: CB, 22 Nov 2019
  • c34: CB, 12 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Number 20,288

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast