Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Alejo de Arizmendi de La Torre

Deceased

Bishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jul 1757BornSan Juan
16 Jul 178527.9Ordained PriestPriest of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
26 Sep 180346.1AppointedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
25 Mar 180446.6Ordained BishopBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
12 Oct 181457.2DiedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)

MicroData Summary for Juan Alejo de Arizmendi de La Torre (VIAF: 38661189)
Bishop Juan Alejo de Arizmendi de La Torre (born , died ) Bishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)

  • a priest for 29.2 years
  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Number 14,458
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,514
  • ab/ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Number 12,899
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 312
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1804, Number 2
  • bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 26 Sep 2016