Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rafael Grovas Felix

Deceased

Bishop of Caguas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Nov 1905BornSanturce
7 Apr 192822.4Ordained PriestPriest of San Juan de Puerto Rico
19 Jan 196559.1AppointedBishop of Caguas, Puerto Rico
2 Mar 196559.3Ordained BishopBishop of Caguas, Puerto Rico
12 Feb 198175.2RetiredBishop of Caguas, Puerto Rico
9 Sep 199185.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Caguas, Puerto Rico

MicroData Summary for Rafael Grovas Felix:
Bishop Rafael Grovas Felix (born , died ) Bishop of Caguas

  • a priest for 63.4 years
  • a bishop for 26.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013