Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan de Santiago y León Garabito

Deceased

Bishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jul 1641BornPalma del Río, Spain
167634.4AppointedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
7 Jun 167735.9SelectedBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
13 Sep 167736.1ConfirmedBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
22 May 167836.8Ordained BishopBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
12 Jul 169452.9DiedBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México

MicroData Summary for Juan de Santiago y León Garabito:
Bishop Juan de Santiago y León Garabito (born , died ) Bishop of Guadalajara

  • a bishop for 16.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 218, Number 1,354
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1678, Number 42
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 213

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 15 Apr 2015