Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomé García de Escañuela, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Durango, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Aug 1627Born
24 Feb 165224.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
6 Oct 167043.1AppointedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
16 Nov 167649.2AppointedBishop of Durango, México
20 Nov 168457.2DiedBishop of Durango, México

MicroData Summary for Bartolomé García de Escañuela
Bishop Bartolomé García de Escañuela O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Bishop of Durango

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArchidona, Spain

  • a priest for 32.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 189, and Page 321
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 206, Number 1,289
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1670, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast