Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel de Mercado Aldrete, O.S.H. †

Deceased

Bishop of Panamá


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Sep 1570AppointedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
1571²Ordained BishopBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
28 Mar 1576AppointedBishop of Panamá
4 Apr 1580DiedBishop of Panamá

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manuel de Mercado Aldrete:
Bishop Manuel de Mercado Aldrete O.S.H. (died ) Bishop of Panamá

  • a bishop for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 82, Number 489
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 278, and Page 268

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 28 Nov 2013