Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Gutiérrez de Cos y Saavedra Seminario

Deceased

Bishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1750BornPiura, Peru
1784²33.2Ordained PriestPriest of Lima, Peru
16 Mar 181867.4AppointedBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru
2 Feb 181968.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru
4 Aug 181968.8InstalledBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru
11 Jan 182675.2SelectedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
13 Mar 182675.4ConfirmedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
28 Jul 182675.8InstalledBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
9 Apr 183382.5DiedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Gutiérrez de Cos y Saavedra Seminario:
Bishop Pedro Gutiérrez de Cos y Saavedra Seminario (born , died ) Bishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 208, and Page 313
  • b: LB, 13 Jul 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013