Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Ambrose Jones, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jul 1865BornCambridge, NY, USA
6 Feb 188822.5ProfessedMember of Order of St. Augustine
15 Mar 189024.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
12 Jan 190741.4AppointedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
24 Feb 190741.5Ordained BishopBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
17 Feb 192155.5DiedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)

MicroData Summary for William Ambrose Jones:
Bishop William Ambrose Jones O.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)

  • a priest for 30.9 years
  • a bishop for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1907, Number 9
  • prof/c1: CB, 24 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015