Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Julián de Antolino

Deceased

Bishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Apr 1690BornCevico de la Torre, Spain
6 May 174858.0AppointedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
1749²58.7Ordained BishopBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
25 Sep 175262.4AppointedBishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
6 Aug 175565.3DiedBishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Julián de Antolino:
Bishop Francisco Julián de Antolino (born , died ) Bishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

  • a bishop for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 67, Number 319

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 23 Oct 2013