Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antulio Parrilla-Bonilla, S.J. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Caguas, Puerto Rico

Titular Bishop of Ucres


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1919Born
3 May 195233.3Ordained PriestPriest of San Juan de Puerto Rico
1957¹37.9EnteredPriest of Society of Jesus
25 May 196546.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Caguas, Puerto Rico
25 May 196546.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Ucres
15 Aug 196546.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ucres
1968²48.9ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Caguas, Puerto Rico
3 Jan 199474.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Caguas, Puerto Rico

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antulio Parrilla-Bonilla (VIAF: 50915857)
Bishop Antulio Parrilla-Bonilla S.J. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Caguas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Lorenzo, Diocese of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
Ordained PriestSan Juan Bautista, Cathedral, San Juan, Diocese of San Juan de Puerto Rico
Ordained BishopDulce Nombre de Jesú, Cathedral, Caguas, Diocese of Caguas
Death PlaceSan Juan, Archdiocese of San Juan de Puerto Rico

  • a priest for 41.6 years
  • a bishop for 28.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1965, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 5 Jan 2019

Quantcast