Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Santa Cruz de la Sierra

Archidioecesis Sanctae Crucis de Sierra



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 30 July 1975
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Bolivia
  • Square Kilometers: 50,000 (19,312 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Arzobispado, Casilla 25, Calle Ingavi 49, Santa Cruz, Bolivia
  • Telephone: (03)3324.416; 3352.194
  • Fax: 3330.181

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Santa Cruz de la Sierra
5 July 1605ErectedDiocese of La Plata o Charcas Diocese of Santa Cruz de la Sierra (erected)
1 December 1917Territory LostDiocese of Santa Cruz de la Sierra Vicariate Apostolic of El Beni o Beni (erected)
22 May 1919Territory LostDiocese of Santa Cruz de la Sierra Vicariate Apostolic of Chaco (erected)
27 January 1930Territory LostDiocese of Santa Cruz de la Sierra Vicariate Apostolic of Chiquitos (erected)
Archdiocese of Santa Cruz de la Sierra
30 July 1975ElevatedDiocese of Santa Cruz de la Sierra Archdiocese of Santa Cruz de la Sierra

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Santa Cruz de la Sierra
1950150,000153,00098.0%2320433,48829ap1951
1966375,000390,00096.2%853616,1477815430ap1967
1970380,000400,00095.0%1379924,13011916730ap1971
Archdiocese of Santa Cruz de la Sierra
1976425,000465,00091.4%1082924,61912420331ap1977
1980620,500640,00097.0%1378916,818111623033ap1981
19901,167,0001,297,00090.0%71141219,644418225344ap1991
19991,300,0001,600,00081.3%281221508,666519648155ap2000
20001,350,0001,650,00081.8%441201648,231516642159ap2001
20011,380,0001,520,00090.8%371211588,734220546660ap2002
20021,400,0002,033,73968.8%301471777,909224150575ap2003
20031,550,0002,033,73976.2%361662027,673525458975ap2004
20041,600,0002,033,73978.7%511381898,465521849470ap2005
20101,805,0002,291,00078.8%661281949,304621757272ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 21 Jul 2014