Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Francisco Placido de Béjar, O.S.Bas. †

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1693BornMadrid, Spain
27 Jun 174349.7SelectedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
9 Sep 174349.9ConfirmedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
24 Jun 174551.7DiedBishop-Elect of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)

MicroData Summary for Francisco Placido de Béjar:
Father Francisco Placido de Béjar O.S.Bas. (born , died ) Bishop-Elect of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 345
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1743, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015